HI HB1650 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Act 009, 4/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Act 009, 4/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending or repealing various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes and the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purpose of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions.
Title
Revision Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Act 009, 4/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2014-04-09 | House | Act 009, on 4/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2014-03-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 399). |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Hee, Ige, Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-21-14. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2982) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Ihara. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 15). |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-13 | House | Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1650&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1650_.HTM |