HI HB1675 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits teachers and persons who are licensed to provide professional counseling from engaging in or advertising sexual orientation change efforts on students and persons under eighteen years of age.
Title
Conversion Therapy; Sexual Orientation; Minors
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2615 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to HLT, EDN, CPC, referral sheet 26
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1675&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1675_.HTM |