HI HB1682 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows LLCs and renewable energy producers to qualify for EZ benefits; extends EZ tax benefits for manufacturing and agricultural businesses, for an additional seven years; allows receipts, sales, and employees of a business's establishments in all EZs within one county to count towards EZ qualifications; exempts payments for construction for a business approved for enrollment in the EZ Program from the general excise tax. (HB1682 HD1)
Title
Enterprise Zone (EZ) Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Har, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Ching. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-12-09 9:00am in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Reported from EBM/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 112) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Berg, Choy, Evans, Manahan, McKelvey, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wakai. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wakai, Ward. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM-AGR on Thursday, 02-05-09 10:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EBM/AGR, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |