HI HB1682 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a student-athlete to enter into a contract providing compensation to the student-athlete for use of the student-athlete's name, image, or likeness. Establishes various provisions prohibiting schools, athletic associations, and conferences from discriminating against student-athletes who receive compensation. Effective 1/1/2021.
Title
Relating To Intercollegiate Athletics.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1682&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1682_.HTM |