HI HB173 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals and transfers the unencumbered balances of various funds and accounts to the credit of the general fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Non-General Funds; Repeal; Accounts
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Harimoto Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Jordan Chair; Kobayashi, Pouha. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 347). |
2015-04-02 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 382) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-01-15. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 155). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |