HI HB173 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB173
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of elections to join the Electronic Registration Information Center and share information with counties to encourage voter participation and ensure integrity of voter registration rolls. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB115 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/PSM, WAM.
HB173 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB173 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=173&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB173_.HTM |