HI HB174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to establish a working group to develop environmental management measures for State-owned lands.
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-16-17 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB174 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=174&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB174_.HTM |