HI HB174 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Chapter 801K, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to provide clarification and flexibility in eyewitness identification procedures.
Title
Relating To Eyewitness Idenifications.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21 at 2:00PM in Room 325. |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-26-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB174 (Carry Over) 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB408 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
SB408 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=174&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB174_.HTM |