HI HB1780 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to TCA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to TCA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September 21 of each year as World Peace Day. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To World Peace Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 220). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kila voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 01-31-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2131 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - Referred to TCA, WAM.