HI HB1905 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-03-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-03-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the court from granting mutual protective orders unless separate petitions are filed.
Title
Domestic Abuse; Mutual Protective Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-03-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-11-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2310 (Same As) 2016-04-13 - Act 004, on 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1905&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1905_.HTM |