HI HB1929 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "isolated wetlands" and "wetlands". Clarifies the definition of "state waters" to include wetlands and isolated wetlands. Requires the Director of Health to determine all wetlands in the State, including whether a wetland is an isolated wetland or is included in the waters of the United States. Prohibit persons from discharging any water pollutant into or at any location that enters state waters.
Title
Relating To Water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2390 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - Referred to HHS/WTL/AEN, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1929&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1929_.HTM |