HI HB1933 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - (H) The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - (H) The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the statute of limitations for civil actions brought by persons subjected to sexual offenses as a minor against the person who committed the act. Revives for a two-year period certain actions for which the statute of limitations had previously lapsed. Authorizes a court to award attorney's fees to a defendant when a accusation of sexual abuse was made with no basis in fact and with malicious intent.
Title
Limitation of Actions; Sexual Offenses Against Minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | (H) The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 01-30-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2588 (Same As) 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 068, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1933 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1933_.HTM |