HI HB1943 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides 12 months of postpartum medical assistance to pregnant women who are enrolled in medicaid insurance coverage during their pregnancy. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Kong, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-28-20 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2429 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.