HI HB2016 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1335).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1335).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public retiree contributions to the EUTF to be paid through withholdings of retirement benefit amounts from the ERS. Beginning after January 1, 2017, requires the EUTF to authorize automatic electronic payments in lieu of withholdings. (HB2016 CD1)
Title
ERS; EUTF; Retiree Co-payments; Automatic Payments
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1335). |
2016-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1335). |
2016-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 161-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 161-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, LoPresti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:30PM in Conference Room 325. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 325. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-16 at 11:00AM in Conference Room 325. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Tupola. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 555) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3587) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-23-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 27). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 681-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2428 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).