HI HB2040 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the environmental review special fund to fund the operations of the Office of Environmental Quality Control and the Environmental Council. Establishes filing fees for environmental review documents filed after December 31, 2012. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Office of Environmental Quality Control; Fees; Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2040 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2040_.HTM |