HI HB2100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Davis-Bacon rights regarding prevailing wages to employees on service contracts with governmental contracting agencies. (HB2100 HD1)
Title
Service Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 86-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Souki, Pine. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 1/29/10 9:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2384 (Same As) 2010-02-05 - (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure.