HI HB2100 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - (H) Act 129, on 6/18/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - (H) Act 129, on 6/18/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii for statewide bee hive research. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB2100 CD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Bees; Hives; Research; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | (H) Act 129, on 6/18/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231). | |
2012-06-20 | (S) Act 129, 6/18/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231). | |
2012-05-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 138-12). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 138-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Kidani, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Nishimoto, Hashem, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 829). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Senator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-30-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-12 at 5:35pm in Conference Room 329. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:50PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 2:45PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-12 2:45PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-12 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Nishihara, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Nishimoto, Hashem Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Riviere. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 569) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3262) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) Reported from EDU/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2875) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Wakai, Slom. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to EDU/AGL, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 126). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-12 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Belatti, Chang, Hanohano, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Wooley, Ching, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-09-12 2:10PM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takai excused (2). | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 114-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-27-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |