HI HB2100 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a criminal offense to intentionally or knowingly direct the beam from a laser device at an occupied aircraft under certain circumstances.
Title
Laser Devices; Aircraft; Criminal Offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2416 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2100&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2100_.HTM |