HI HB2182 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the membership of the State Highway Safety Council appointed by the Governor from twenty to ten. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Highway Safety Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3150 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.