HI HB2200 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to match federal funds for medicaid benefits for adult vision services. Authorizes caregiver consent by affidavit to allow minors to participate in programs under Individuals with Disabilities Act and section 504, Rehabilitation Act of 1973. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2200 HD1)
Title
Kupuna Caucus; Medicaid; Adult Vision Appropriation; Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 490-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, Wooley, Ching. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-06-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2310 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1).