HI HB2200 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to continue the ports-of-entry biosecurity program. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Biosecurity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong, McDermott. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-10-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3379 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 138, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1239).