HI HB2203 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that the civil service benefits of department of education civil service employees are the same as those provided to civil service employees of other executive branch agencies.
Title
Civil Service; Department of Education
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Reported from EDN/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Chang, Hanohano, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takai, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching, Pine; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Manahan, Shimabukuro. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/LAB on Wednesday, 01-27-10 2:00 pm in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2327 (Same As) 2010-02-05 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.