HI HB2203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to ENE/AGL, WTL.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to ENE/AGL, WTL.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows solar energy facilities on agricultural lands with soil classified as class B or C under a special use permit if the area is also made available for compatible agricultural activities and the facilities are decommissioned and removed within twelve months of the conclusion of operation. Effective January 1, 2030. (HB2203 HD2)
Title
Agricultural Lands; Solar Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to ENE/AGL, WTL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 310). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Onishi, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-02-18 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 02-18-14 at 11:00 am in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP/WAL. |
2014-02-13 | House | Meeting Scheduled on Tuesday, 02-18-14 8:30AM in conference room 325 has been canceled. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Awana, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2014-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-10-14 10:05AM in conference room 312. |
2014-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-14 at 10:05AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-06-14 9:40AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP/WAL, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |