HI HB2203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to track and publish the use of all exclusionary discipline disaggregated by student subgroup. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Disciplinary Actions In Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 186). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (3) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 269-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka, Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2578 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to EDU, JDC.