HI HB2203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist DIBSHawaii LLC in the construction of a net zero carbon capture storage utilization platform that will recover vented carbon dioxide emissions and scrub them into food grade liquid carbon dioxide. Effective 7/1/2100. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Dibshawaii Llc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 497-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:45AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2865 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 198, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).