HI HB2259 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the National Fire Protection Association's Hydrogen Technologies Code to hydrogen production, storage, use, and handling for stationary and portable applications in the State and establishes the state hydrogen permitting authority. Contains appropriation. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Energy; State Hydrogen Codes and Standards; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-29-12 5:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-29-12. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-12 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Carroll, Chang, Har, Herkes, Ito, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Nakashima. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 10 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to PBM, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |