HI HB2271 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a grant program within chapter 163D, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Agribusiness Development Corporation; Grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2800 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 26
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2271&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2271_.HTM |