HI HB2293 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special number plates to recognize the University of Hawaii Cancer Center.
Title
Relating To Special Number Plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] | Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] | Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] |
Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] | Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2293&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2293_.HTM |