HI HB2343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-22 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-22 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily increases rate of general excise tax from 4% to 5% from 07/01/2010 to 06/30/2012.
Title
General Excise Tax; Temporary 2-Year Increase of 1%
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2343&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2343_.HTM |