HI HB2378 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WLA/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WLA/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Board to set, charge, and collect fines for violations of section 183-17, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Clarifies that any person violating any provision of part II of chapter 183, Hawaii Revised Statutes, or any rule adopted pursuant thereto shall be guilty of a petty misdemeanor, except for any violation of section 183-17, Hawaii Revised Statutes, that shall be a misdemeanor. Repeals section 183-4, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (HB2378 HD2)
Title
Penalties; Chapter 183; Repeal; Section 183-4
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WLA/JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 300). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2907 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to WLA/JDL, WAM.