HI HB2384 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the School Facilities Authority with the Department of Education as the administrator of the School Facilities Special Fund. Changes the means of financing for a portion of funds appropriated for deposit into the School Facilities Special Fund to expand pre-kindergarten student capacity within the State from general funds to general obligation bond funds. Repeals the funds appropriated into and out of the School Facilities Special Fund by Act 257, SLH 2022, as amended. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The School Facilities Special Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3213) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 365). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Ward. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-26-24 4:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 02-26-24. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 244-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3073 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to EDU, WAM.