HI HB2430 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-05-16 9:15AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-05-16 9:15AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires dentist, physician, osteopathic physician, physician assistant, nurse, and pharmacist licensee applicants who have had a license, permit, or ability to practice suspended in another jurisdiction to undergo a hearing to show cause why suspension should be terminated prior to being issued a license to practice in Hawaii. Requires the board of dental examiners, Hawaii medical board, board of nursing, and board of pharmacy to summarily suspend a Hawaii license upon a determination that a licensee has had a license, registration, or ability to practice suspended or revoked in any other jurisdiction, pending a hearing to show cause. Requires orders of summary suspension or disciplinary action taken due to actions arising in other jurisdictions to be public record.
Title
Licensing; Applicants for Licensure; Competency; Discipline; Summary Suspension; Hearing; Board of Dental Examiners; Hawaii Medical Board; Board of Nursing; Board of Pharmacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-05-16 9:15AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2675 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Act 038, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2430&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2430_.HTM |