HI HB2440 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the walkway behind the capitol building as Memorial Mall. Creates a working group to design bronze plaques and kahili to portray Hawaiian rulers in perpetuity and to interchange the Queen Liliuokalani statue located on the grounds of the capitol building with the Eternal Flame memorial on Beretania street. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2440 HD1)
Title
Queen Liliuokalani Statue; Eternal Flame Memorial; Memorial Mall; Hawaii State Capitol; Working Group; Hawaiian Rulers
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Ohno, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Onishi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to VMI, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2505 (Same As) 2014-02-13 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.