HI HB2487 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - (H) Act 153, on 6/25/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - (H) Act 153, on 6/25/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the allowance and age requirements for service by water safety officers who become a member after June 30, 2012. Amends the ordinary disability and death retirement allowance for persons becoming a class H member after June 30, 2012. Requires employers to pay the additional costs resulting from significant non-base pay increases. Adds various definitions to part II of chapter 88, HRS. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB2487 CD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | (H) Act 153, on 6/25/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). | |
2012-06-26 | (S) Act 153, 6/25/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). | |
2012-05-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Cullen, Johanson, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 115-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 115-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Oshiro, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-19-12 2:35PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 759). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Choy, Yamashita, Johanson. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 621) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3286) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ryan; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3008) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-12 10:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 219). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Takumi. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-14-12 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2749 (Same As) 2012-03-20 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).