HI HB2556 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the research and development program in the Hawaii technology development corporation to help Hawaii-based small businesses optimize research and development performed in Hawaii. Establishes the research and development special fund. Appropriates funds for the purposes of the research and development program. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Innovation Business.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Kidani Co-Chairs; L. Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 742) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3580) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2944) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 42). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3000 (Same As) 2018-07-10 - Act 141, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Research and Development Program
Research and Development Special Fund
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Research and Development Program
Research and Development Special Fund