HI HB2596 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $25,000,000 to the Department of Education for the design and construction of electrical upgrades and installation of air conditioning units in public school classrooms, beginning with those priority schools identified by the Department. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Public Schools; Air Conditioning; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3). |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2014-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2596&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2596_.HTM |