HI HB2610 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a narrow hearsay exception for non-testimonial statements made by domestic violence victims to certain government officials within 24 hours of an incident of domestic violence and prior to the arrest of the defendant, as long as the statement bears sufficient indicia of reliability. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 608) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 9 offered. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-01-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3715) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 344). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 372-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20 2:00pm. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-03-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-20 2:00PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |