HI HB338 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the terms and conditions of a student voting member on an appointed Board of Education. (SD1)
Title
Board of Education; Appointment; Student Member
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 1:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Kidani, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Takumi, M. Lee Co-Chairs; Belatti, Nakashima, Wooley, Johanson. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 385). | |
2011-04-05 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 390) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-11. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-11 1:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDU. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 90). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Keith-Agaran voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 752) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Morikawa; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 85) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Chang, Mizuno, Nakashima. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-02-11 in room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 01-31-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |