HI HB395 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants tuition waivers to native Hawaiian students at the University of Hawaii.
Title
University of Hawaii
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-02-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HAW, HED, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |