HI HB545 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 119, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 119, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers excess revenues from the bureau of conveyances special fund to the Hawaii historic preservation special fund. Makes an appropriation for an integrated information management system and document digitization for the State's historic preservation division. Effective 6/29/2016. (SD2)
Title
Non-General Funds; Transfer; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act 119, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2016-06-23 | House | Act 119, on 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Ing, Kawakami, Souki excused (4). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Yamane, Jordan, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2016-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Choy, Yamane, Jordan Co-Chairs; Ichiyama. |
2016-04-20 | House | Re-referred to HED, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 500) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3566) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-16 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-16 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1153) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kidani, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kahele. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 57). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 682), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |