HI HB602 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a towing operator from releasing a motor vehicle unless the party recovering the vehicle provides proof that the motor vehicle is currently registered. Requires county ordinances that regulate towing operations to include this prohibition. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB602 HD2)
Title
Motor Vehicle Towing and Storage
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TIA/PSM, CPN. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 241). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 832) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13. |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 330) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |