HI HB602 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the unfunded liabilities task force to develop recommendations to address state and county unfunded liabilities.
Title
Unfunded Liabilities Task Force; Employees Retirement System; County Unfunded Liabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-13-15 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=602&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB602_.HTM |