HI HB602 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB602
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from the vehicle weight tax a military member who is assigned to a unit outside of the State, is a member in good standing, and claims Hawaii as the member's state of legal residence for purposes of withholding state income taxes from the member's military pay. (HB602 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Vehicle Weight Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 55) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to PVM, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB109 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB602 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).
HB602 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).