HI HB624 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB624
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases the tax burden on lower income workers by reducing the income tax rate to zero for all but top brackets of income earned.
Title
Relating To Income Tax Reduction.
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Pierick [R] | Rep. David Alcos [R] | Rep. Diamond Garcia [R] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB624 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=624&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB624_.HTM |