HI HB649 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds definitions for "qualifying diagnosis" and "severe and persistent mental illness." Requires the provision of services to individuals with a qualifying diagnosis. Appropriates funds for mental health services previously eliminated or reduced, and for substance abuse treatment and mental health support services for individuals who are homeless or at risk of becoming homeless. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB649 HD1)
Title
Mental Health; Adult Mental Health; Homeless Services; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 556) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB43 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.