HI HB822 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the Hawaii Association of Conservation Districts to assist with its staffing and operating costs. (HB822 HD2)
Title
Appropriation; Hawaii Association of Conservation Districts ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 236). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 854) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-13-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |