HI HB895 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the marriage license fee to increase allocation to the Spouse and Child Abuse Special Accounts, and establish allocation to the Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Special Fund and the Vital Statistics Improvement Special Fund. Upon approval, takes effect on July 1, 2050. (HB895 HD1)
Title
Marriage Licenses; Fees ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 375) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-13 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-13 at 11:00am. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:05AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1126 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to HTH, WAM.