HI HB895 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB895
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows insurance commissioner discretion in requiring motor vehicle insurers to have claims, adjustment, and sales service at an office in the State, to facilitate access to such services by electronic technology.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB895 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=895&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB895_.HTM |