HI HB932 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB932
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the total amount of motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credits allowed per year from $50,000,000 to an unspecified amount. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Motion Picture, Digital Media, And Film Production Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-10-23 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB932 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).