HI HCR100 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR100
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Congress Of The United States To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution Limited To Proposing Amendments That Impose Fiscal Restraints On The Federal Government, Limit The Power And Jurisdiction Of The Federal Government, And Limit The Terms Of Office For Its Officials And For Members Of Congress.
Title
Urging The Congress Of The United States To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution Limited To Proposing Amendments That Impose Fiscal Restraints On The Federal Government, Limit The Power And Jurisdiction Of The Federal Government, And Limit The Terms Of Office For Its Officials And For Members Of Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR96 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
HCR100 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JDC.
SCR6 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
HCR100 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JDC.
SCR6 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=100&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR100_.HTM |